CA AB991 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22001.5, 22119.2, 22119.3, 22121, 22141, 22404, 22509, 22515, 22711, 22714, 22717, 22900, 22903, 22950, 23001, 24114, 24209, 24209.3, 24210, 24211, 24212, 24213, 24214, 24214.5, 26000, 26002.5, 26132, 26139.5, 26400, 26401, 26506, 26806, 26807.6, 26812, 26906.6, 27100, 44987, and 87768.5 of, and to add Sections 22144.3 and 26142.5 to, the Education Code, relating to state teachers' retirement.
Title
State teachers' retirement.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Assembly - AB 991 P.E., R.& S.S. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BONTA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB991 Committee on Public Em ployees, Retirement, (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 991 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB991 Committee on Public Em ployees, Retirement, (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 991 P.E., R.& S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2226.). |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1664.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1109.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |