CA AB990 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2600, 2601, and 6400 of, and to add Section 6401 to, the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisons: inmate visitation.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 990 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB990 Santiago et al. By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 990 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB990 Santiago et al. By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 990 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-06 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 2930.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2341.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 18. Page 1847.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6401 | New Code | See Bill Text |