CA AB989 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 65589.5.1 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing Accountability Act: appeals: Office of Housing Appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 989 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 989 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to the Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 1739.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65589.5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |