CA AB988 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to the Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1714.55 of the Civil Code, to add Article 6.1 (commencing with Section 53123) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, to add Section 324.9 to the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 41007.2, 41007.3, 41013, 41020, 41021, 41022, 41023, 41024, 41026, 41028, 41030, 41031, 41032, 41046, 41050, 41098, 41100, 41128, 41135, 41136, and 41150 of, to amend Article 1 (commencing with Section 41020) and Article 2 (commencing with Section 41030) of Chapter 2 of Part 20 of Division 2 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 41020) of Part 20 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to emergency services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health: 988 crisis hotline.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 988 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to the Com. on E., U. & C.
2021-06-24SenateRe-referred to Coms. on G.O., HEALTH, and E., U. & C.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2021-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and C. & C.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1714.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53123New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code324.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41007.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41007.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41013Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41020Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41021Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41022Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41023Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41024Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41026Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41028Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41030Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41031Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41032Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41046Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41050Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41098Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41100Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41128Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41135Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41136Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41150Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback