CA AB986 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 3034, 7152, and 7152.5 to, and to add and repeal Section 7149.06 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting and sport fishing licenses: sport fishing license duration: reduction in license fees for veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 986 GALLAGHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and V.A.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3866.)
2018-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code3034New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code714Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code7149.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code7149.06Repealed CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code7152New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code7152.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback