CA AB984 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4463 and 4853 of, and to add Section 4854 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicle identification and registration: alternative devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 984 Wilson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Wilson et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Luz Rivas et al. By Hueso Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Luz Rivas et al. By Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 984 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Wilson et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Luz Rivas et al. By Hueso Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB984 Luz Rivas et al. By Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 984 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5211.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2569.) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2565.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 2. Page 1737.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 4463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4853 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4854 | New Code | See Bill Text |