CA AB983 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2855 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employee obligations: exclusivity options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-29-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 983 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 983 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 1401.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 5). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |