CA AB983 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 740.16 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation electrification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation electrification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and C. & C.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code740.16New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback