CA AB981 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.145 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 791.01, 791.02, 791.04, 791.06, 791.08, 791.09, and 791.13 of, and to add Sections 791.24, 791.25, 791.30, and 791.31 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance Information and Privacy Protection Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 981 Daly Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 791.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 791.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 791.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 791.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |