CA AB979 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56332 and 56332.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local agency formation commissions: district representation.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB979 Lackey By Moorlach (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 979 LACKEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 979 LACKEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2180.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1654.) |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 56001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 56332 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 56332.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |