CA AB978 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1946.2 and 1947.12 of, and to add and repeal Section 798.30.5 of, the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehome parks: rent caps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-12 - Assembly - AB 978 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB978 Quirk-Silva et al. By Caballero (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - AB 978 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-07-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2021-07-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-07-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-07-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 6.).
2021-06-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22).
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 3).
2021-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1946.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1947.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code798.30.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB978

Bill Comments

feedback