CA AB976 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 8.3 (commencing with Section 11820.10) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Artificial Intelligence in State Government Services Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 976 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1822.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11820.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback