CA AB975 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 81009, 82028, 86112.5, and 87500.3 of, and to repeal and add Section 87500 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: filing requirements and gifts.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB975 Luz Rivas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB975 Luz Rivas (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 975 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB975 Luz Rivas (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 975 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4879.) |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Umberg. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4878.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3441.) |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Luz Rivas. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Luz Rivas. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 81009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 86112.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87500 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 87500.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |