CA AB975 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5111 to the Public Contract Code, relating to school facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
School facilities: lease-leaseback contracts: contractor relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Education Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 975 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Assembly - AB 975 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1595.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20111.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 5111 | New Code | See Bill Text |