CA AB972 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 35 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 20010 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: deceptive audio or visual media.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure35Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code20010Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback