CA AB97 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1367.51 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10176.61 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: insulin affordability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 97 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-26SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-08-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 8.
2020-12-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1367.51Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10176.61Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback