CA AB965 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3051 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth offender hearings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 965 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB965 Mark Stone By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 965 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 577, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3270.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2668.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 23. Page 1977.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code3051Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3055Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback