CA AB959 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8310.8 to the Government Code, relating to data collection.
Title
Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender Disparities
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 959 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB959 Chiu By Hall (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 959 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB959 Chiu By Hall (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 959 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 565, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3147.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2714.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1690.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8310.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |