CA AB956 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8544.1 to the Government Code, relating to the California State Auditor, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California State Auditor: background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-06 - Assembly - AB 956 Alvarez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB956 Alvarez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 956 Alvarez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB956 Alvarez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 956 Alvarez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2568.). |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1828.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1462.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8544.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |