CA AB955 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 2.3 (commencing with Section 78230) of Chapter 2 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges: intersession extension programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 955 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB955 Williams By Liu (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 955 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2013-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 3114.).
2013-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2263.).
2013-09-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-05SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-01SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2013-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 1511.)
2013-05-16AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1447.)
2013-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 1).
2013-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2013-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78230New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_955&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130422_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130516_amended_asm_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130516_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130625_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130222_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130422_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130516_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130625_amended_sen_v94.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130903_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130905_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_bill_20131010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130409_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130501_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130520_0119PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130612_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130701_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130830_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130909_0627PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0951-1000/ab_955_vote_20130910_0154PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback