CA AB954 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1374.193 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10120.4 to the Insurance Code, relating to dental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental services: third-party network access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 954 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB954 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 954 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3305.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2713.).
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2038.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1374.193New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10120.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback