CA AB954 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 13486) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Water and Wastewater Loan and Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 954 MATHIS Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 954 MATHIS Third Reading Urgency (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1921.). |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13486 | New Code | See Bill Text |