CA AB948 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 61040 of, and to add Sections 61040.3 and 61040.4 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: community service districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 61040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 61040.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61040.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 61105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |