CA AB944 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11008.135 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: sponsored noncitizen: indigence exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 944 Quirk Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB944 Quirk et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Date (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 944 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3246.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2605.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1821.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11008.135Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback