CA AB943 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 20 in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 16428.87 and 16428.88 to the Government Code, and to amend Sections 39712 and 39720 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: competitive grant programs: funding objectives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2022-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (January 10).
2022-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2021-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code16428.87New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16428.88New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39712Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39720Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback