CA AB940 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5892 of, and to add Part 3.3 (commencing with Section 5832) to Division 5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

College Mental Health Services Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2021-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5832New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5892Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback