CA AB937 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 5423.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 5423.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 17.15 (commencing with Section 7282.7) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 13125 of, and to repeal Sections 5025 and 5026 of, the Penal Code, relating to immigration enforcement.
Title
Immigration enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB937 Carrillo et al. By Wiener (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 937 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 937 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 5423.). |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 21. Page 1906.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 20). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7282.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5025 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5026 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |