CA AB933 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1367.243 of, and to add and repeal Section 1367.52 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 10123.205 of, and to add and repeal Section 10123.66 of, the Insurance Code, relating to prescription drugs.
Title
Prescription drug cost sharing.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 11). |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.243 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.205 | New Code | See Bill Text |