CA AB933 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23363.1 of, and to add Section 23363.3 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Distilled spirits manufacturers: licenses: tastings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 933 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB933 Skinner By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 933 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB933 Skinner By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 933 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3113.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2256.). |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1832.) |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23363.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23363.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |