CA AB933 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3209.3 and 4610 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: medical treatment.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-24 - Assembly - AB 933 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB933 Fong By Yee (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 933 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB933 Fong By Yee (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 933 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-07 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |
2010-08-24 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6603.) | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4777.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2009-06-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1609.) | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 6). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |