CA AB932 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 11 (commencing with Section 20050) to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to poverty.
Title
Cradle-to-Career Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 20050 | New Code | See Bill Text |