CA AB931 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 835a of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: use of force by peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 931 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-16Senate(Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5341.)
2018-08-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-16SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19).
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-25SenateRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2018-04-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1489.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code196Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code835Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4098.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback