CA AB93 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 22. Page 2145.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 22. Page 2145.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 833.6 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal law.
Title
Criminal procedure: consensual searches.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 93 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 93 Bryan Motion to Reconsider (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 93 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 93 Bryan Motion to Reconsider (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 93 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 22. Page 2145.). |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2140.) |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-05-25 | Read third time. Refused passage. | |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 7). |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 833.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |