CA AB93 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 20 in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 7.1 (commencing with Section 122446) to Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pandemic response practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2022-01-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code122446New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback