CA AB929 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 938, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 938, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4320 of the Family Code, relating to spousal support.
Title
Spousal support factors: domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 929 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB929 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 929 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB929 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 929 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 938, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6364.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5276.). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 964.) |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 4320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |