CA AB928 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 185039 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to earthquake safety.
Title
Earthquake early warning system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-04 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2010-01-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-01-04 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 4). | |
2009-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |