CA AB927 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17053.81 and 23623.1 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: hiring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.81 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6377.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |