CA AB926 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4124, 4124.5, and 4124.6 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Fire prevention: local assistance grant program: projects: report.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |