CA AB925 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2009 - 50% progression
Action: 2010-08-26 - To inactive file on motion of Senator Liu.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6.3 (commencing with Section 42380) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recycling: single-use plastic beverage container caps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 925 SALDANA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-26 To inactive file on motion of Senator Liu.
2010-08-20 Read second time. To third reading.
2010-08-19 From inactive file. To second reading.
2009-09-08 To inactive file on motion of Senator Liu.
2009-07-08 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-07-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 6).
2009-06-30 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2009-05-14 Referred to Com. on EQ.
2009-05-04 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-04 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 34. Page 1237.)
2009-04-22 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-04-21 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
2009-04-02 Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2009-02-27 From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2009-02-26 Read first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback