CA AB920 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 23504.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Craft distillers: direct shipping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 920 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB920 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 920 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB920 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Allen Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 920 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5379.). |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.) |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1339.) |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23504.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |