CA AB920 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11830, 11830.1, 11830.5, 11831, 11831.2, 11831.5, 11831.6, 11831.7, 11832, and 11833 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 11830) of Part 2 of Division 10.5 of, to amend and renumber Section 11830.01 of, and to add Section 11831.51 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Substance abuse recovery or treatment providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB920 Petrie-Norris et al. By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 920 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 920 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 920 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 920 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-12 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3566.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3552.) |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2926.). |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 12). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 1504.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11830.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11830.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11831.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11832 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |