CA AB92 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8252 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 10290 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to early childhood education.
Title
Preschool and child care and development services: family fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 92 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB92 Reyes et al. By Limón (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 92 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB92 Reyes et al. By Limón (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 92 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5220.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1622.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8252 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |