CA AB917 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 40240 and 40241 of, and to repeal and add Section 40240.5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: video imaging of parking violations.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 917 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB917 Bloom et al. By Min (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 917 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB917 Bloom et al. By Min (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 917 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 2879.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2348.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 3. Page 1722.) (June 29). |
2021-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1813.) |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |