CA AB917 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 66265) to Chapter 4.5 of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student health: student suicide prevention policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code215Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66265New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback