CA AB916 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65850.02 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Zoning: bedroom addition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB916 Salas et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 916 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB916 Salas et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 916 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 916 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB916 Salas et al. By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 916 Salas Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5236.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2022-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3186.) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |