CA AB911 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 686, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 686, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6.3 (commencing with Section 8592.20) to Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: emergency information: study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 911 Rodriguez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB911 Rodriguez By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 911 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB911 Rodriguez By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 911 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 686, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3103.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2494.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O., E., U. & C. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1980.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and G.O. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8592.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |