CA AB91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052, 17140, 17140.3, 17140.4, 17276, 17276.21, 17276.22, 17560.5, 17564, 19131.5, 23711, 23711.4, 24343, 24416, 24416.21, 24416.22, 24422.3, 24652, 24654, 24673.2, and 24701 of, to add Sections 17052.1, 17144.8, 17201.2, 17271, 17563.51, 17859, 24343.1, 24451.1, and 24652.6 to, and to repeal and add Sections 18031.5 and 24941.5 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Income taxation: Loophole Closure and Small Business and Working Families Tax Relief Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - AB 91 Burke Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB91 Burke et al. By Mitchell Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 91 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB91 Burke et al. By Mitchell Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 91 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 2370.). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1602.). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 17). |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1173.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |