CA AB909 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 84102 and 84103 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: statements of acknowledgment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 909 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-07-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2019-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 27).
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2019-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code84102Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84103Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84103.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback