CA AB907 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6.1 (commencing with Section 12098.50) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to outdoor recreation.
Title
Office of Outdoor Recreation and Public Lands Enhancement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12098.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5010.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |