CA AB904 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.626 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.868 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: doulas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 904 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB904 Calderon et al. By Rubio (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 904 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB904 Calderon et al. By Rubio (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 904 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3336.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2634.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 1881.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.626 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.868 | New Code | See Bill Text |